Stamey et al v. Howell et al

Plaintiff: Richard Stamey and Valerie Stamey
Defendant: Michael Howell, Victoria Howell and Bitterroot Star, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2016cv00023
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: RAVALLI
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor Defendants and against Plaintiffs. (ASG)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 37 Response to Motion filed by Richard Stamey, et al., 34 MOTION for Discovery filed by Victoria Howell, et al., 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Victoria Howell, et al. See Order for ruling/details. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/24/2017. (dle)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 5 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/7/2016. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamey et al v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stamey
Represented By: Robert C. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Stamey
Represented By: Robert C. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitterroot Star, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?