AARESTAD v. Tricon Timber, LLC
Plaintiff: JOAN AARESTAD
Defendant: Tricon Timber, LLC
Case Number: 9:2016cv00051
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MINERAL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ASG)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and adopting Findings and Recommendations 78 in full. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/16/2018. (ASG)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss as to Tricon Timber, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/14/2016. (APP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AARESTAD v. Tricon Timber, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAN AARESTAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricon Timber, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?