Save Our Cabinets et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Plaintiff: |
Save Our Cabinets, Earthworks and Clark Fork Coalition |
Defendant: |
United States Department of Agriculture, U.S. Forest Service and Christopher S. Savage |
Case Number: |
9:2016cv00053 |
Filed: |
April 1, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Montana |
Office: |
Missoula Office |
County: |
SANDERS |
Presiding Judge: |
Donald W. Molloy |
Nature of Suit: |
Environmental Matters |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 4321 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
99
ORDER IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint stipulation (Doc. 98 ) is ADOPTED. Plaintiffs' motions (Doc. 90 in 9:16-cv-00053-DWM and Doc. 85 in 9:16-cv-00056-DWM) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/19/2018. Associated Cases: 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 9:16-cv-00056-DWM (NOS)
|
May 21, 2018 |
Filing
97
ORDER granting Joint MOTION to Stay Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motions for Attorneys Fees. Further proceedings on Plaintiffs' motion for an award of fees and costs, including the filing of memoranda and evidentiary and other materials support ing that motion, are stayed for an additional 30 days, until June 25, 2018. At that time, Plaintiffs and Federal Defendants shall provide notice of settlement or explain why further briefing is necessary. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/21/2018. Associated Cases: 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 9:16-cv-00056-DWM (NOS)
|
March 27, 2018 |
Filing
94
ORDER that the briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' motions for fees and costs (Doc. 90 and CV 16-56-M-DWM, Doc. 85) is STAYED. The Federal Defendants' responses shall be filed on or before May 25, 2018. Replies may be filed pursuant to Local Rule 7.l(d)(l)(C). Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/27/2018. Associated Cases: 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 9:16-cv-00056-DWM (APP)
|
June 29, 2017 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting 70 Motion to Vacate. The Forest Service's decision to approve the Montanore Mine Project is VACATED, and the 2016 Record of Decision and 2015 Joint Final Environmental Impact Statement are set aside and remanded to the Forest Service for further action as outlined in the May 2017 Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/29/2017. (NOS)
|
May 30, 2017 |
Filing
69
OPINION and ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' motions for summary judgment (Docs. 35, 39, 48, 52) are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Plaintiffs' motions (Docs. 35 in 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 32 in 9:16-cv-00056-DWM; 39 in 9:16-cv-00053- DWM, 36 in 9:16-cv-00056-DWM) are GRANTED as to their claims related to Montana's non-degradation standards under the Clean Water Act and Organic Act, their NFMA claim related to FW-DC-WTR-02 and the Inland Native Fish Strategy, and their NEPA c laim related to mitigation of the Poorman site. The defendants motions (48 in 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 45 in 9:16-cv-00056-DWM; 52 in 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 49 in 9:16-cv-00056-DWM) are GRANTED in all other respects. The matter is remanded for further review consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/30/2017. (NOS)
|
November 21, 2016 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting (45) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Tuchman for Montanore Minerals Corporation in case 9:16-cv-00053-DWM; granting (42) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Tuchman for Montanore Minerals Corporati on in case 9:16-cv-00056-DWM. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is subject to withdrawal unless Mr. Tuchman, within fifteen days of the date of this Order, files a notice acknowledging his admission under the terms set forth. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/21/2016. Associated Cases: 9:16-cv-00053-DWM, 9:16-cv-00056-DWM (NOS, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?