Lagervall et al v. Missoula County Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Robert T. Lagervall and P.L.
Defendant: Missoula County Public Schools, Ted Fuller and Jennie Haines
Case Number: 9:2016cv00057
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (APP) Copy to Lagervall
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Robert T. Lagervall, 21 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery and Deem Requests Admitted filed by Jennie Haines, Missoula County Public Schools, Ted Fuller, Motions ter minated: 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Robert T. Lagervall, 21 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery and Deem Requests Admitted filed by Jennie Haines, Missoula County Public Schools, Ted Fuller., FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jennie Haines, Missoula County Public Schools, Ted Fuller. () Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/22/2017. (TCL)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/29/2016. (APP, )
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 13 Motion to Stay Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/17/2016. (TCL, )
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert T. Lagervall, Order Setting: ( Response to Order to provide addresses due by 7/5/2016.), Motions terminated: 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert T. Lagervall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/14/2016. (TCL, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagervall et al v. Missoula County Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T. Lagervall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missoula County Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennie Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?