Brandon v. Sherwood et al
Plaintiff: Christy L. Brandon
Defendant: Michael J. Sherwood and Michael J. Sherwood, P.C.
Third_party_defendant: United States Trustee Program, United States Bankruptcy Trustee, United States Department of Justice and United States of America
Case Number: 9:2016cv00113
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Stay District Court's Order and Judgement Pending Appeal; granting 29 Supplemental Motion to Stay District Court's Order and Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/12/2017. (ASG)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the Bankruptcy Court's Order awarding judgment in favor of Trustee Christy L. Brandon, and against Michael J. Sherwood, and Michael J. Sherwood, P.C. for the sum of $53,532.00 is AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Bankruptcy Court's judgment is AFFIRMED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/17/2017. (ASG)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 12 Motion to Strike ; granting in part 14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying as moot 16 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/1/2016.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon v. Sherwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy L. Brandon
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Represented By: Kyle W. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Sherwood
Represented By: Anna C. Conley
Represented By: David B. Cotner
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Sherwood, P.C.
Represented By: David B. Cotner
Represented By: Michael J. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: United States Trustee Program
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: United States Bankruptcy Trustee
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?