Adelos, Inc. v. Halliburton Company et al

Plaintiff: Adelos, Inc.
Defendant: Halliburton Company, Halliburton Energy Services, Inc., Optiphase, Inc., SensorTran, Inc. and Pinnacle Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2016cv00119
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LAKE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/5/2017. (ASG)
October 19, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 John Roddy Pace's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/19/2016. (ASG, )
October 14, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric C. Green. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/14/2016. (NOS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adelos, Inc. v. Halliburton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelos, Inc.
Represented By: Randy J. Cox
Represented By: John C. Herman
Represented By: Peter M. Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Reis
Represented By: Gregory F. Wesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Company
Represented By: Kathleen L. DeSoto
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Represented By: Emma L. Mediak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen L. DeSoto
Represented By: Bradley J. Luck
Represented By: Emma L. Mediak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optiphase, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SensorTran, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?