Rustad-Link v. Providence Health and Services et al
Plaintiff: |
Dawn Rustad-Link |
Defendant: |
Providence Health and Services and Unum Group Corporation |
Case Number: |
9:2016cv00136 |
Filed: |
October 20, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Montana |
Office: |
Missoula Office |
County: |
FLATHEAD |
Presiding Judge: |
Dana L. Christensen |
Nature of Suit: |
Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
44
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Dawn Rustad-Link against Providence Health and Services and Unum Group Corporation. (NOS)
|
January 31, 2018 |
Filing
36
AMENDED OPINION & ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Unum shall reimburse Rustad-Link for the benefits it withheld, and shall reinstate her present and future benefi ts without the offset. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a request for fees and costs, supported by affidavit and other documentation, within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link' s request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a reasoned request for an award of pre-judgment interest within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link's request. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/31/2018. (NOS)
|
January 30, 2018 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Unum shall reimburse Rustad-Link for the benefits it withheld, and shall reinstate her present and future benefits without the off set. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a request for fees and costs, supported by affidavit and other documentation, within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link's request. IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that Rustad-Link shall submit a reasoned request for an award of pre-judgment interest within 14 days of the date of this Order. Unum shall have 14 days to respond to Rustad-Link's request. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/30/2018. (ASG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?