Martin v. Blair, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sharline M. Martin
Defendant: Blair, LLC, Comenity Bank and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 9:2016cv00147
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LAKE
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/13/2017. (NOS)
June 22, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting: dismissal papers due by 7/22/2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/22/2017. (ASG)
December 14, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Zachary Miller. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/14/2016. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Blair, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharline M. Martin
Represented By: Terry A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair, LLC
Represented By: Jill M. Gerdrum
Represented By: Zachary D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Jill M. Gerdrum
Represented By: Zachary D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?