Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Native Ecosystems Council
Defendant: Leanne Marten and United States Forest Service
Case Number: 9:2017cv00021
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Vacate. The briefing deadline currently set for August 8, 2018, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/9/2018. (ASG)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Preliminary Injunction 19 entered in this matter on May 30, 2017, is hereby DISSOLVED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/22/2018. (ASG)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Remand. The Forest Service's Record of Decision for the Stonewall Vegetation Project is VACATED and REMANDED to the Forest Service for completion of a supplemental environmental analysis of the effects of the Park Creek Fire on the proposed project. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/12/2018. (ASG)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 33 Motion for Reconsideration. See order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/23/2017. (ASG)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 30 Status Report filed by Leanne Marten, United States Forest Service. IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants Status Report is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. The Defendants shall have until November 1, 2017, to file their summary judgment response brief. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/10/2017. (APP)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Stonewall Vegetation Project is ENJOINED until further Order by this Court. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/30/2017. (ASG)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER setting case management plan: April 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/23/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Kristine Marie Akland
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Ecosystems Council
Represented By: Kristine Marie Akland
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Marten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?