Method, LLC et al v. Make it Right Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Method, LLC and Method Contracting, LLC
Defendant: Make it Right Foundation, Make it Right - Montana, LLC, MIR Montana, LLC, MIR Innovations, LLC, Samuel Whitt, John Does 1-50 and ABC Businesses 1-20
Case Number: 9:2017cv00025
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/25/2019. (ASG)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER STAYING CASE pending arbitration. Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2018. Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand 11 is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings 13 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Defendants 59 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/1/2018. (ASG)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Lift Stay and Request to Set Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the MIR Defendants' Motion to Arbitrate 13 and any reply to the MIR Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand 22 by November 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/26/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Method, LLC et al v. Make it Right Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Method, LLC
Represented By: Dana L. Hupp
Represented By: Chris A. Johnson
Represented By: Martin Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Method Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Dana L. Hupp
Represented By: Chris A. Johnson
Represented By: Martin Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Make it Right Foundation
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Make it Right - Montana, LLC
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIR Montana, LLC
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIR Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Whitt
Represented By: Bruce F. Fain
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Businesses 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?