GTAT Corporation v. Fero

Plaintiff: GTAT Corporation
Defendant: Chad Fero
Counter_claimant: Chad Fero
Counter_defendant: GTAT Corporation
Case Number: 9:2017cv00055
Filed: May 1, 2017
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. All pending motions are MOOT and all deadlines are VACATED. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction over enforcement of the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/21/2017. (NOS)
September 14, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark A. Finkelstein. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen days, GTAT shall either explain why it needs five lawyers or notice the withdrawal of at least one attorney of its choosing. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/14/2017. (NOS)
July 5, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kelly Marie Morrison. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/20/2017. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/5/2017. (APP)
May 25, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that GTAT's request for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. The temporary restraining order originally entered May 3, 2017, and extended May 16, 2017, is LIFTED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/25/2017. (NOS)
May 24, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 28 Notice filed by GTAT Corporation. IT IS ORDERED that the parties cease filing additional/supplemental/rebuttal documents without the permission of the Court. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/24/2017. (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GTAT Corporation v. Fero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GTAT Corporation
Represented By: Christine Duh
Represented By: Andrea Weiss Jeffries
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Alan F. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Fero
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chad Fero
Represented By: Robert C. Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: GTAT Corporation
Represented By: Christine Duh
Represented By: Andrea Weiss Jeffries
Represented By: Robert C. Lukes
Represented By: Alan F. McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?