Glick v. Montana Supreme Court
Petitioner: Ronald D. Glick
Respondent: Montana Supreme Court
Appellee: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. aka RMI
Case Number: 9:2017cv00062
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (APP) Copy mailed to Glick
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Glick's motion to stay the proceedings in the Montana Supreme Court is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/30/2017. (APP) Copy mailed to Glick
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald D. Glick, denying as moot 4 MOTION to Stay filed by Ronald D. Glick, Motions terminated: 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ronald D. Glick, 4 MOTION to Stay filed by Ronald D. Glick., FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Ronald D. Glick. () Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/31/2017. (TCL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glick v. Montana Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald D. Glick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Montana Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. aka RMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?