Crow Indian Tribe et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Crow Indian Tribe, Crow Creek Sioux Tribe, Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, Piikani Nation, The Crazy Dog Society, Hopi Nation Bear Clan, Northern Arapaho Elders Society, David Bearshield, Kenny Bowekaty, Llevando Fisher, Elise Ground, Arvol Looking House, Travis Plaited Hair, Jimmy St. Goddard, Pete Standing Alone and Nolan J. Yellow Kidney
Defendant: United States of America, Ryan Zinke, United States Department of Interior, Jim Kurth, United States Fish and Wildlife Service and Hilary Cooley
Case Number: 9:2017cv00089
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: XX out of state
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER: Crow Indian Tribe's Motion 323 is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/5/2021. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER dismissing with prejudice (317) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 9:17-cv-00089-DLC; dismissing (266) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 9:17-cv-00117-DLC; dismissing (268) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 9:17-cv-00118-DLC; dismissing (266) M otion for Attorney Fees in case 9:17-cv-00119-DLC; dismissing (261) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 9:17-cv-00123-DLC; dismissing (236) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 9:18-cv-00016-DLC. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/22/2021. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER dismissing with prejudice (325) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 9:17-cv-00089-DLC. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/11/2021. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER re Stipulation 333 in 9:17-cv-00089-DLC. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/21/2020. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER setting briefing schedule on attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/17/2020. NOTE: Please file all motions and supporting materials in LEAD CASE 17-89-M and spread to ALL member cases. Thank you. (ASG)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting (327) Motion. Plaintiffs shall have 45 days to continue settlement discussions prior to notifying the Court of the parties' intended path forward as outlined in the motion. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/3/2020. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER: Following the Ninth Circuits transfer of consideration of the Attorneys' Fee Claims to this Court 307 , IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file their fee motions under the lead case and spread to the member case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/10/2020. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ASG)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of the Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (NOS)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 IT IS ORDERED that (1) the Plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and motions for summary judgment (Docs. 75, 89, 182, 185, 188, 189, 191, and 193) are GRANTED; (2) the Defendants' and Intervenor-Defendants' cross-motions for summary judgment (Docs. 202, 208, 210, 212, 213, 217, and 219) are DENIED; (3) the Final Rule delisting the Greater Yellowstone Ecosystem grizzly bear is VACATED and REMANDED; and (4) The Plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction (Docs. 251 and 252) are DENIED as moot. (5) Plaintiff Aland's motion to supplement the final administrative record and allow limited discovery (Doc. 171) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/24/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (APP)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER: the Temporary Restraining Order issued on August 30, 2018 254 is EXTENDED. Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors continue to be temporarily restrained and enjoined from authorizing and/or implementing grizzly bear hunting. This Order shall remain in effect for fourteen days from this date. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/13/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting in part (251) Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting in part (252) Motion for TRO. The motions are granted to the degree that the Plaintiffs seek a temporary restraining order. Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors are temporari ly restrained and enjoined from authorizing and/or implementing grizzly bear hunting. This Order shall remain in effect for fourteen days from this date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will withhold ruling on the motions to the degree that the Plaintiffs seek a preliminary injunction or any other more long-term-relief. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/30/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (NOS)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting (232) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Beth Baldwin) in case 9:17-cv-00089-DLC. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/20/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting (179) Motion to Clarify in case 9:17-cv-00089-DLC. The second paragraph of Section II of the Court's Order dated May 14, 2018 is revised to read: The Court finds that in an effort to expedite the APA and ESA claims identified in Footnote 2 prior to a potential fall hunting season, bifurcating and staying other claims is appropriate. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/17/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting (143) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John I. Kittel in case 9:17-cv-00089-DLC; granting (106) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 9:17-cv-00117-DLC; granting (108) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 9:17-cv-00118-DLC; granting (106) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 9:17-cv-00119-DLC; granting (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 9:17-cv-00123-DLC; granting (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 9:18-cv-00016-DLC. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/7/2018. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/23/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (APP)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying as moot (125) Safari Club/NRA's motion to intervene in case 9:17-cv-00089-DLC. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER that Plaintiff Aland may appear telephonically at the March 13, 2018 hearing. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/12/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (ASG)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Aland's obligation to serve all parties will be complete upon the clerk's office filing his documents to all the parties in these consolidated cases (See attached order in full). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/2/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC et al. (APP)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting (108) Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/26/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC, 9:17-cv-00117-DLC, 9:17-cv-00118-DLC, 9:17-cv-00119-DLC, 9:17-cv-00123-DLC (ASG)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of D. David DeWald. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/19/2018. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC, 9:17-cv-00117-DLC, 9:17-cv-00118-DLC, 9:17-cv-00119-DLC, 9:17-cv-00123-DLC (NOS)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting (54) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michael Jean for NRA of America. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/28/2017. Served via CM/ECF upon local counsel Robert Bell. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC, 9:17-cv-00117-DLC, 9:17-cv-00118-DLC, 9:17-cv-00119-DLC, 9:17-cv-00123-DLC (ASG)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part (35) Motion to Intervene by Safari Club/NRA. The Court denies the motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(a), and grants the motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24(b). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/11/2017. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC, 9:17-cv-00117-DLC, 9:17-cv-00118-DLC, 9:17-cv-00119-DLC, 9:17-cv-00123-DLC (ASG)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER consolidating cases: CV-17-89-M-DLC, CV-17-117-M-DLC, CV-17-118-M-DLC, CV-17-119-M-DLC, CV-17-123-M-DLC. LEAD CASE NUMBER IS CV-17-89-M-DLC. Administrative Record due by 1/5/2018. Status Report due by 3/23/2018. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS/DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/5/2017. Associated Cases: 9:17-cv-00089-DLC, 9:17-cv-00117-DLC, 9:17-cv-00118-DLC, 9:17-cv-00119-DLC, 9:17-cv-00123-DLC (ASG)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order regarding consolidation. Show Cause Response due by 11/29/2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/13/2017. (ASG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow Indian Tribe et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crow Indian Tribe
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crow Creek Sioux Tribe
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Standing Rock Sioux Tribe
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piikani Nation
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Crazy Dog Society
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hopi Nation Bear Clan
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Arapaho Elders Society
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bearshield
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Bowekaty
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Llevando Fisher
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Ground
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arvol Looking House
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Plaited Hair
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy St. Goddard
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Standing Alone
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan J. Yellow Kidney
Represented By: Peter J. Breuer
Represented By: Katie D. Frayler
Represented By: Michael W. Holditch
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Coby Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: Coby Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Coby Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kurth
Represented By: Coby Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Coby Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Cooley
Represented By: Coby Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?