Trebas v. Guild Mortgage Company et al
Plaintiff: William F. Trebas, Jr.
Defendant: Guild Mortgage Company, Ally Bank, Does 1 through 10 and GMAC Capital Trust 1
Case Number: 9:2017cv00113
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: BEAVERHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (APP) Copy to Trebas
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying as moot 54 MOTION in Limine filed by Ally Bank, Motions terminated: 54 MOTION in Limine filed by Ally Bank., FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ally Bank. () Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/31/2018. (TCL)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/4/2017. (APP) Copy to Trebas
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trebas v. Guild Mortgage Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Trebas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guild Mortgage Company
Represented By: Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Michael S. Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Capital Trust 1
Represented By: Michael S. Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?