Webster v. Psychiatric Medical Care, LLC

Plaintiff: Rachel E. Webster
Defendant: Psychiatric Medical Care, LLC
Case Number: 9:2017cv00116
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: LINCOLN
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12102
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 27 Motion to Allow Pro Hac Vice Counsel to Attend Depositions without the Attendance of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/10/2018. (ASG)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Melissa Panagakos for Defendant. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/29/2018. (ASG)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 19 Motion. Plaintiffs pro hac vice counsel, Patrick J. Kirby, may attend depositions in this matter without the attendance of local counsel. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/9/2018. (ASG)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Patrick J. Kirby for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/31/2017. Copy served on local counsel via CM/ECF. (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Psychiatric Medical Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel E. Webster
Represented By: Patrick J. Kirby
Represented By: Cory R. Laird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Psychiatric Medical Care, LLC
Represented By: Veronica T. von Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?