Lai v. Walgreens Co.

Plaintiff: Debbie Lai
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Case Number: 9:2017cv00125
Filed: September 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/30/2018. (ASG)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 18 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/18/2018. (ASG)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: While the Court appreciates the parties' agreement concerning theprotective order, if the parties are desirous of some form of court action in regards to this stipulation, the Court requires the filing of a motion. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/14/2017. (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lai v. Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Lai
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?