Duram v. Samaritan House

Plaintiff: Daniel M. Duram
Defendant: Samaritan House
Case Number: 9:2018cv00029
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: FLATHEAD
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Samaritan House against Daniel M. Duram (APP) Copy to Duram
April 10, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/10/2018. (APP) Copy to Duram
March 13, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING the case to Chief Judge Christensen, REFERRING the case to Magistrate Judge Lynch. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/13/2018. (APP) Copy mailed to Duram

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duram v. Samaritan House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel M. Duram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samaritan House
Represented By: Danielle Ann Rand Coffman
Represented By: Ashley Ann Di Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?