Adams v. Roberts

Plaintiff: Brendan E. Adams
Defendant: Howard C. Roberts
Case Number: 9:2018cv00148
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 5 Brendan E. Adams ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Brendan E. Adams. (Bell, Stephen)
September 18, 2018 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Howard C. Roberts. (Wagner, Nathan)
August 29, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brendan E. Adams. Howard C. Roberts served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Bell, Stephen)
August 23, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Howard C. Roberts. Original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (NOS)
August 23, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2184432. (NOS)
August 23, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Howard C. Roberts filed by Brendan E. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lake County Order of Civil Restraint, #2 Exhibit B - Lake County Temporary Order of Protection, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan E. Adams
Represented By: Stephen D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard C. Roberts
Represented By: Nathan G. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?