Walker et al v. Wilderness Alternative School, Inc.
Plaintiff: J.P., Amy Provost, Lisa Walker, Roy Provost, C.G. and John Walker
Defendant: Wilderness Alternative School, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00156
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by C.G., J.P., Amy Provost, Roy Provost, John Walker, Lisa Walker. (Gross, Keith)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/28/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/28/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/28/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 1:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/4/2018. (dle)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilderness Alternative School, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wilderness Alternative School, Inc. for Wilderness Alternative School, Inc... (Smith, Brian)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wilderness Alternative School, Inc.. (Smith, Brian)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Exhibits served on Nancy Brekke, Registered Agent on 09/07/2018, filed by C.G., J.P., Amy Provost, Roy Provost, John Walker, Lisa Walker. (Gross, Keith)
September 5, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2190147. (ASG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wilderness Alternative School, Inc. Original mailed to Counsel Gross. (ASG)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Wilderness Alternative School, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2, #3 Ex 3, #4 Ex 4, #5 Ex 5, #6 Ex 6, #7 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Wilderness Alternative School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.P.
Represented By: Keith L. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Provost
Represented By: Keith L. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Walker
Represented By: Keith L. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Provost
Represented By: Keith L. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.G.
Represented By: Keith L. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: Keith L. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilderness Alternative School, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Smith
Represented By: Justin K. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?