Sangret v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara F. Sangret
Defendant: Does 1-10, Greyhound Lines, Inc. and Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership
Case Number: 9:2018cv00157
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara F. Sangret. (Durocher, Roland)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership. (Guffin, Katie)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Greyhound Lines, Inc.. (Duncan, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM James M. Duncan appearing for Defendant Greyhound Lines, Inc. (Duncan, James)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Barbara F. Sangret in state court on 8/2/2018. (ASG)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of state court document. (Attachments: #1 2_Summons, #2 3_Summons, #3 4_Summons, #4 5_Summons, #5 6_Amended Statement of Claim) (ASG)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership. (Guffin, Katie)
September 10, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2191780. (ASG)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-1085. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Statement of Claim, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sangret v. Greyhound Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Partners Limited Partnership
Represented By: Jesse Beaudette
Represented By: Katie C. Guffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara F. Sangret
Represented By: Roland B. Durocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?