Poulson v. Karpyak et al

Plaintiff: Kermit Ty Poulson
Defendant: Tim Fox and Shaleesha Karpyak
Case Number: 9:2018cv00160
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
0 Judge: Dana L Christensen
1 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kermit Ty Poulson, Motions terminated: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. () Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/9/2018. (TCL) Modified on 10/17/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Poulson (APP).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/1/2018. (TXB) Modified on 10/17/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Poulson (APP).
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Kermit Ty Poulson. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kermit Ty Poulson (TAG)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Kermit Ty Poulson (TAG)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Mail sent to Poulson Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Poulson with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE) (TAG) Modified on 9/25/2018: copy mailed to Poulson in response to phone call (TAG). Modified on 10/2/2018: copy delivered to Poulson in person during week of 9/24/18 (TAG).
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP, filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (TAG) Modified on 10/17/2018 to reflect removing "Lodged" from entry (APP).
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kermit Ty Poulson. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulson v. Karpyak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaleesha Karpyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kermit Ty Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?