J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc. v. General Equipment Supplies, Inc.

Plaintiff: J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc.
Defendant: General Equipment Supplies, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00162
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Correction: re 10 Disclosure Statement. The filing error relates to: Discovery. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (ASG)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc.. (Bell, Robert)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc.. (Bell, Robert)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc.. (Bell, Robert)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc.. (Bell, Robert)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/6/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/6/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/6/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 10:30 AM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/22/2018. (dle)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Equipment Supplies, Inc.. (Ridgeway, Susan)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by General Equipment Supplies, Inc.. (Ridgeway, Susan)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana L. Christensen for all further proceedings. Judge Donald W. Molloy no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/1/2018. (dle)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of state court file (original placed on shelf). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ASG)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed on 8/9/2018. (ASG)
September 18, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2196909. (ASG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ravalli County, case number DV-18-336. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc. v. General Equipment Supplies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Excavating and Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Susan G. Ridgeway
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Equipment Supplies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Susan G. Ridgeway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?