High Country Paving, Inc. v. United Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: High Country Paving, Inc.
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv00163
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 Surreply re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint by High Country Paving. (ASG)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/10/2018. (ASG)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Strike #7 Reply to Response to Motion or, Alternatively, for Leave to File Surreply filed by High Country Paving, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Surreply) (Tierney, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #7 Reply to Response to Motion or, Alternatively, for Leave to File Surreply Jeffrey J. Tierney appearing for Plaintiff High Country Paving, Inc. (Tierney, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint filed by United Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judge Seely ruling) (Dyre, Jon)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent United Fire Group, Inc. for United Fire and Casualty Company.. (Dyre, Jon)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint filed by High Country Paving, Inc.. (Tierney, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by High Country Paving, Inc.. (Tierney, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint filed by United Fire and Casualty Company. (Dyre, Jon)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Complaint Jon T. Dyre appearing for Defendant United Fire and Casualty Company (Dyre, Jon)
September 19, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2197102. (NOS)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Fire and Casualty Company from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-1160 filed by United Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (CDH) (Documents regenerated on 9/24/18.)(NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Country Paving, Inc. v. United Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Country Paving, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Baldwin
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Tierney
Represented By: Trent M. Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Jon T. Dyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?