Vasquez v. BNSF Railway Company

Plaintiff: William Vasquez
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv00164
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Vasquez. BNSF Railway Company waiver sent on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Bowman, Christopher)
September 24, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. Original mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (NOS)
September 19, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2197114. (NOS)
September 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company, filed by William Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (CDH) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Vasquez
Represented By: William G. Jungbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?