Jarrett v. Western States Equipment Co.

Plaintiff: Christopher Jarrett
Defendant: John Does 1-5 and Western States Equipment Co.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00174
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
0 Judge: Dana L Christensen
1 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2018 6 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Christopher Jarrett. (Williams, Jason)
October 15, 2018 5 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Western States Equipment Co.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Case Register) (CDH)
October 12, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western States Equipment Co. identifying Corporate Parent The Terteling Company, Inc. for Western States Equipment Co... (Mahe, Kathryn)
October 12, 2018 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Western States Equipment Co.. (Mahe, Kathryn)
October 5, 2018 2 Featured Case PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/6/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/6/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/6/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/5/2018. (TXB)
October 4, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2204134. (NOS)
October 4, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Western States Equipment Co. from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-1139 filed by Western States Equipment Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Summons) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarrett v. Western States Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western States Equipment Co.
Represented By: Katelyn J. Hepburn
Represented By: Kathryn Mahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Jarrett
Represented By: Jason A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?