Umina v. MacKenzie et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Umina
Defendant: Lucas Lumina, Does 1-50 and Roderick L. MacKenzie
Case Number: 9:2018cv00175
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Received confirmation of case transfer from the Eastern District of California - case no. 2:18-cv-02767. (CDH)
October 11, 2018 Case transferred to District of California Eastern. Copy of transfer order sent. (NOS)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court, Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/11/2018. (TCL) Modified on 10/11/2018; copy mailed to Plaintiff (NOS).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Donald W. Molloy recused. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/5/2018. (dle) Modified on 10/10/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Plaintiff (APP).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/5/2018. (dle) Modified on 10/10/2018 to reflect copy mailed to Plaintiff (APP).
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L. MacKenzie. (MacKenzie, Roderick)
October 4, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX900012863 (KJL)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L. MacKenzie from Superior Court of California in and For the County of Sacramento, case number 34-2018-00235367., filed by Lucas Lumina, Roderick L. MacKenzie. (Attachments: #1 Joinder in Notice of Removal Action, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 Answer) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umina v. MacKenzie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Lumina
Represented By: Roderick L MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick L. MacKenzie
Represented By: Roderick L MacKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Umina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?