Jackson Contractor Group, Inc. v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.
Defendant: AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd. and Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv00186
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants answer due on or before 2/4/2019. (dle)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/28/2018. (dle)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer John H. Tarlow appearing for Plaintiff Jackson Contractor Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Tarlow, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.. AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd. waiver sent on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Tarlow, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.. Indian Harbor Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/21/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Tarlow, John)
November 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd. answer due 12/6/2018; Indian Harbor Insurance Company answer due 12/6/2018. (NOS)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Commissioner of Insurance for the State of Montana on November 15, 2018, filed by Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.. (Tarlow, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Commissioner of Insurance for the State of Montana on November 15, 2018, filed by Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.. (Tarlow, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd., Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Originals mailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (NOS)
November 13, 2018 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2222544. (NOS)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd. and Indian Harbor Insurance Company filed by Jackson Contractor Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Contractor Group, Inc. v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust International Underwriters, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Tarlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?