Lewis et al v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Lewis and Kenton Lewis
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Co. and Wallace Franklin Johnson
Case Number: 9:2018cv00187
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER RE-SETTING: Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/24/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/3/2019. (dle)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 1/17/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 1/17/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 1/17/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2019 at 3:00 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/11/2018. (dle)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Beaudette, Jesse)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Beaudette, Jesse)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Beaudette, Jesse)
November 16, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2224347 (KJL)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GEICO General Insurance Co. from Montana's Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV 15-758., filed by GEICO General Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Am Complaint, #3 Exhibit Case Register Report, #4 Exhibit Affidavit, #5 Exhibit Complaint Adding Defendant, #6 Exhibit Summons, #7 Exhibit Ins Commr Ltr, #8 Exhibit Letter, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Co.
Represented By: Jesse Beaudette
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Franklin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Lewis
Represented By: Rex L. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenton Lewis
Represented By: Rex L. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?