Fuller v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Fuller
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 9:2018cv00194
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 2/21/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 2/21/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 2/21/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/7/2019. (dle)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Gomez, Michelle)
November 28, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2229509 (KJL)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, case number DV-18-1352., filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michelle L. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Fuller
Represented By: Eric Ryan Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?