Snyder v. Rosenthal et al
Plaintiff: Joanna M. Snyder
Defendant: Mark Henkel and Jill Rosenthal
Case Number: 9:2018cv00195
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Mail re #10 sent to Snyder at FCDC Returned as Undeliverable. (TAG)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Joanna M. Snyder. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/18/2019. Mailed to Snyder (TAG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, by Plaintiff Joanna M. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT.Mailed to Snyder (TAG)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in ful; denying #6 Motion. This dismissal counts as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). Any appeal of the disposition would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/4/2019. Mailed to Snyder (TAG)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner by Plaintiff Joanna M. Snyder. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Snyder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/6/2018. Mailed to Snyder and FCDC (TAG)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner filed by Joanna M. Snyder. Signed by Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/6/2018. Mailed to Snyder. (TAG) Modified on 12/10/2018 to correct signing judge (TAG).
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Snyder with docket sheet. (TAG)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Joanna M. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter) (TAG)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joanna M. Snyder. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Rosenthal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna M. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Henkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?