Trebas v. Ally Bank

Plaintiff: William F. Trebas, Jr.
Defendant: Ally Bank
Case Number: 9:2018cv00201
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File by Plaintiff William F. Trebas, Jr. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Objection) (APP)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ally Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment) (Kolivas, Whitney)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by William F. Trebas, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/18/2019. (TCL) Modified on 1/23/2019 to reflect copy mailed to Trebas (APP).
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ally Bank. (Original to Plaintiff.) (NOS)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ally Bank. (NOS)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint. Mailed to Trebas with docket sheet (TAG)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ally Bank. Original given to Trebas (TAG)
December 18, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX9-13138 (TAG)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Bank, filed by William F. Trebas, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trebas v. Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Represented By: Whitney M. Kolivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Trebas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?