Burtsfield v. Weyerhaeuser

Plaintiff: Rocky Burtsfield
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser
Case Number: 9:2018cv00205
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/11/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/11/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/11/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 3:00 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/29/2019. (dle)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 State Court COMPLAINT filed by Rocky Burtsfield on December 13, 2018. (ASG)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of state court file. Original filed placed on shelf in Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 state court documents) (ASG)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Weyerhaeuser. (Faure, Jean)
January 2, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2242953. (ASG)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weyerhaeuser. (Faure, Jean)
December 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weyerhaeuser from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV-18-1289D. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Ex 2 - Summons, #3 Ex 3 - Service of Process, #4 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burtsfield v. Weyerhaeuser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Burtsfield
Represented By: Dean K. Knapton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Katie Rose Ranta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?