350 Montana et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center, 350 Montana, Sierra Club and Wildearth Guardians
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior, Glenda Owens, David Berry, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, Marcelo Calle, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and Margaret Everson
Intervenor Defendant: Signal Peak Energy, LLC
Case Number: 9:2019cv00012
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint,, and SIGNAL PEAK ENERGY, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (Martin, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Margaret Everson, Glenda Owens, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Office of Surface Mining. (Originals mailed to Counsel Hernandez.) (NOS)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Glenda Owens, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, filed by Sierra Club, 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Summons Balash, #2 Summons Bernhardt, #3 Summons Berry, #4 Summons Calle, #5 Summons Department of Interior, #6 Summons Everson, #7 Summons Office of Surface Mining, #8 Summons Owens, #9 Summons Fish and Wildlife Service) (Hernandez, Shiloh)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (Martin, John)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/12/2019. (APP)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Applicant Defendant-Intervenor Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (NOS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene. John C. Martin appearing for Applicant Defendant-Intervenor Signal Peak Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #3 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) (NOS)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sierra Club, 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Wildearth Guardians. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Service upon U.S. Defendants, #2 Service upon U.S. Attorney, #3 Service upon U.S. Attorney General) (Hernandez, Shiloh)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/8/2019. Proposed case management plan on or before April 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/22/2019. (NOS)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Glenda Owens and Office of Surface Mining Reclamation and Enforcement. Originals mailed to Plaintiffs' counsel. (NOS)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Plaintiffs as to Glenda Owens and U.S. Office of Surface Mining; address incorrect. (NOS)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to Plaintiffs' Counsel. (NOS)
January 16, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2250477. (NOS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph Balash, David Bernhardt, David Berry, Marcelo Calle, Glenda Owens, U.S. Department of the Interior, U.S. Office of Surface Mining, filed by Sierra Club, 350 Montana, Montana Environmental Information Center, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 350 Montana et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenda Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Office of Surface Mining
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Balash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelo Calle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Everson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 350 Montana
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Laura King
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Signal Peak Energy, LLC
Represented By: John C. Martin
Represented By: Victoria A. Marquis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?