Soto v. Nielsen

Plaintiff: Pamela Soto
Defendant: Kristjen M. Nielsen
Case Number: 9:2019cv00013
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
0 Judge: Dana L Christensen
1 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Directing Clerk to Serve defendant; Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order. An answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order. Waiver of Service due by 4/1/2019. Notice of Appearance due by 5/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Appendix Waiver of Service) (TCL) Modified on 3/5/2019 to reflect mailing out regarding service (APP).
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kristjen M. Nielsen, filed by Pamela Soto. (APP)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pamela Soto, Motions terminated: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pamela Soto., Order Setting: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/29/2019. (TCL) Modified on 1/29/2019: mailed to Soto with form (TAG).
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Soto with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Pamela Soto. (TAG)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Pamela Soto. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto v. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?