Matosich v. Wright Medical Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Matosich
Defendant: Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc. and Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00016
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Twidwell, Kevin)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/18/2019. (TCL)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2278125.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendants Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of David C. Van Dyke, #2 Certification for Admission for DVD, #3 Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/13/2019. (TCL)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Mailing of Consent: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Kevin A. Twidwell, James T. Towe. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 3/28/2019. (APP)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2275852.) Kevin A. Twidwell appearing for Defendants Does 1-10, Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate, #3 Proposed Order) (Twidwell, Kevin)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Twidwell on behalf of All Defendants (Twidwell, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/23/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/23/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/29/2019. (TXB)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig Matosich. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Towe, James)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Craig Matosich. Wright Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent on 1/25/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. (Towe, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Wright Medical Group, Inc. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. Original mailed to counsel. (ASG)
January 23, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2252865. (ASG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Craig Matosich. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matosich v. Wright Medical Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Michael Fawaz
Represented By: Kevin A. Twidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Michael Fawaz
Represented By: Kevin A. Twidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Van Dyke
Represented By: Michael Fawaz
Represented By: Kevin A. Twidwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Matosich
Represented By: James T. Towe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?