Rodoni v. Royal Outdoor Products, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Rodoni
Defendant: Axiall Corporation, The Home Depot, Inc., Royal Outdoor Products, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Westlake Chemical Corporation, Royal Group Inc. and John Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 9:2019cv00017
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Axiall Corporation, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Royal Group Inc., Royal Outdoor Products, Inc., The Home Depot, Inc., Westlake Chemical Corporation. (Baldassin, Matthew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Errata to filed by Daniel G. Rodoni. (Bybee, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended filed by Daniel G. Rodoni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screen shot, #2 Exhibit Expert's report, #3 Exhibit CPSC recall, #4 Exhibit Annual information form) (Bybee, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Michael D. Bybee filed by Daniel G. Rodoni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Screen shot, #2 Exhibit Expert report, #3 Exhibit CPSC recall, #4 Exhibit Annual Information Form) (Bybee, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Steve Stevens filed by Daniel G. Rodoni. (Bybee, Michael)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Daniel G. Rodoni. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6/8/18 letter) (Bybee, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Axiall Corporation, Royal Group Inc., Royal Outdoor Products, Inc., Westlake Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Shaun Ahn, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Debora Thelen, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Gary Taylor, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of John McKinnon) (Baldassin, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Matthew A. Baldassin appearing for Defendants Axiall Corporation, Royal Group Inc., Royal Outdoor Products, Inc., Westlake Chemical Corporation (Baldassin, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., The Home Depot, Inc.. (Baldassin, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., The Home Depot, Inc.. (Baldassin, Matthew)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Axiall Corporation, Royal Group Inc., Royal Outdoor Products, Inc., Westlake Chemical Corporation. (Baldassin, Matthew)
January 23, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2253771. (ASG)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-339. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Complaint, #2 Ex B - Summonses/Affidavit of Service, #3 Ex C - Acknowledgment and Waiver of Service, #4 Ex D - State Court Case Register, #5 Ex E - Demand Letter, #6 civil cover sheet) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodoni v. Royal Outdoor Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axiall Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A. Baldassin
Represented By: Matthew Dolphay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Baldassin
Represented By: Matthew Dolphay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Outdoor Products, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Baldassin
Represented By: Matthew Dolphay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Baldassin
Represented By: Matthew Dolphay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Matthew A. Baldassin
Represented By: Matthew Dolphay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Group Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Baldassin
Represented By: Matthew Dolphay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Rodoni
Represented By: Lon J. Dale
Represented By: Michael David Bybee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?