United States Fire Insurance Company v. Greater Missoula Family YMCA

Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Greater Missoula Family YMCA
Case Number: 9:2019cv00021
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Greater Missoula Family YMCA. Original mailed to Brown Law Firm, P.C. (ASG)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by United States Fire Insurance Company of Kristin Gallagher (MacIntyre, Shane)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by United States Fire Insurance Company of Mark Hamilton (MacIntyre, Shane)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristin V. Gallagher for United States Fire Insurance Company. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/31/2019. (NOS)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Hamilton. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within 15 days. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/31/2019. (NOS)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Kristin Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2257530.) Shane Alexander MacIntyre appearing for Plaintiff United States Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (MacIntyre, Shane)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Mark Hamilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2257525.) Shane Alexander MacIntyre appearing for Plaintiff United States Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (MacIntyre, Shane)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits A to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment re: #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (MacIntyre, Shane)
January 25, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2255528. (NOS)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greater Missoula Family YMCA filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fire Insurance Company v. Greater Missoula Family YMCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Missoula Family YMCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Shane Alexander MacIntyre
Represented By: Mark F. Hamilton
Represented By: Kristin V. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?