Melillo v. Johnson Controls, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pamela Renee Melillo
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00025
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Remark: Docket report and case file sent to Missoula County District Court via email. (NOS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand. This case is remanded to the Montana Fourth Judicial Court. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/4/2019. (NOS)
March 2, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Documents William E. Rideg appearing for Plaintiff Pamela Renee Melillo (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rideg, William)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/4/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/4/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/4/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for April 11, 2019, at 2:30 p.m. at the Missoula River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/27/2019. (NOS)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian Morris for all further proceedings. Judge Dana L. Christensen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/19/2019. (ASG)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Trim, Roger)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Controls, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls, Inc... (Chacon, Raul)
February 5, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2259715. (NOS)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-18-1585 filed by Johnson Controls, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Action - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 State Court Action - Summons Issued on Johnson Control Inc., #3 State Court Action - Summons with Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit B - Declaration of Heather Wunderlich, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melillo v. Johnson Controls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Roger G. Trim
Represented By: Raul Chacon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Renee Melillo
Represented By: William E. Rideg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?