Lipson v. Grover + Company, LLC
Plaintiff: David Lipson and Bone Rattler, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Grover + Company, LLC and Scott Elden
3Rd Party Defendant: QZM INC., Paws Up Ranch, LLC and Nadine Lipson
Case Number: 9:2019cv00036
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Count Five re Abuse of Process filed by Bone Rattler, LLC, David Lipson. (Williams, Mark)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Count Five re Abuse of Process Mark S. Williams appearing for Counter Defendants Bone Rattler, LLC, David Lipson, Plaintiffs Bone Rattler, LLC, David Lipson (Williams, Mark)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Williams on behalf of David Lipson (Williams, Mark)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/9/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 5/9/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 5/9/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/3/2019. (dle)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 Proof of Service filed by David Lipson. Service by Proof of Service of Summons on 3/11/2019. (Christian, Kirby)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Paws Up Ranch, LLC, QZM INC., Nadine Lipson, COUNTERCLAIM against David Lipson by Grover Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conceptual contract, #2 Exhibit Non-binding Arb Notice, #3 Exhibit Proposed Final Contract) (Muldoon, Brian)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grover Company, LLC Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Muldoon, Brian) (Modified to amend docket text.)(NOS)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Bone Rattler, LLC, David Lipson by Grover Company, LLC, Scott Elden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conceptual Contract, #2 Exhibit Notice Nonbinding Arb., #3 Exhibit Proposed Final Contract) (Muldoon, Brian)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scott Elden. (Original mailed to Counsel Christian.) (NOS)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Lipson. (Christian, Kirby)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Grover Company, LLC. (TAG) Modified on 2/19/2019 to reflect original summons mailed to counsel for plaintiff (TAG).
February 19, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2265649 (TAG)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipson v. Grover + Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Grover + Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Scott Elden
Represented By: Brian Muldoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lipson
Represented By: Kirby S. Christian
Represented By: Peter B. Ivins
Represented By: Mark S. Williams
Represented By: Aaron M. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bone Rattler, LLC
Represented By: Kirby S. Christian
Represented By: Peter B. Ivins
Represented By: Mark S. Williams
Represented By: Aaron M. Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: QZM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Paws Up Ranch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Nadine Lipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?