United States of America v. Crozier et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Flathead County, Neva M. Crozier and Jeffrey B. Crozier
Case Number: 9:2019cv00046
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/30/2019. (NOS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Neva M. Crozier. (Original to AUSA in Billings.) (NOS)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION Between the United States and Flathead County by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Flathead County waiver sent on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jeffrey B. Crozier waiver sent on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Travis R. Ahner, Flathead County Attorney on 3/19/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/18/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jeffrey B. Crozier on 3/19/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/18/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Neva M. Crozier on 3/19/19 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 4/18/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Crozier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flathead County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neva M. Crozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Crozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?