Whetstine v. Saul

Plaintiff: Jason Whetstine
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 9:2019cv00084
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Andrew Saul added to case as Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Nancy A. Berryhill (Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration) terminated. (CDH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendant on 06/06/2019, filed by Jason Whetstine. (Koenig, Andrew)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Original summons emailed to counsel (APP)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/6/2019. (TXB)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Jason Whetstine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) Modified on 5/6/2019 (KJL).
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Andrew Thomas Koenig appearing for Plaintiff Jason Whetstine Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whetstine v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Whetstine
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?