Wilson v. Joy
Plaintiff: Anna Wilson
Defendant: Lisa Joy
Case Number: 9:2019cv00096
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Anna Wilson. (McFarland, Dylan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/15/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/15/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/15/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/17/2019. (dle)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Anna Wilson of Firm Name and Fax Number Change (McFarland, Dylan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint filed by Lisa Joy in state court on May 2, 2019. (ASG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Anna Wilson in state court on March 26, 2019. (ASG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of state court file (via file share program). (Attachments: #1 Doc 2, #2 Doc 3, #3 Doc 5, #4 Doc 6, #5 Doc 7, #6 Doc 8, #7 Doc 9, #8 Doc 10) (ASG)
June 6, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2320100 (KJL)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lisa Joy from DV 19-319, case number Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County., filed by Lisa Joy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer, #4 Exhibit C - Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Req. for Statement of Claim, #6 Exhibit E - Rule 16B Scheduling Order, #7 Exhibit F - Statement of Claim, #8 Exhibit G - Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit H - Certificates of Service) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Wilson
Represented By: Dylan McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Joy
Represented By: Fred Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?