Allt et al v. George et al
Plaintiff: Adriana Allt and Thomas Allt
Defendant: Tim J. George, Business Entities I through X, TA Operating Montana LLC and Eugene Truck Haven, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2019cv00098
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by TA Operating Montana LLC. (McIntosh, Ian)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Thomas Allt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Daue, E.)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Thomas Allt. (Daue, E.)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/20/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/20/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/20/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 3:00 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/24/2019. (dle)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (of John Anderson) filed by Eugene Truck Haven, Inc.. (Halverson, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eugene Truck Haven, Inc.. (Halverson, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction James R. Halverson appearing for Defendant Eugene Truck Haven, Inc. (Halverson, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Thomas Allt (Hanby, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Thomas Allt (Whitehead, Jarom)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Michael Hanby for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/11/2019. (ASG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION Michael J. Hanby II to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2335284.) E. Craig Daue appearing for Plaintiff Thomas Allt (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Daue, E.)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Jarom Whitehead for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/10/2019. Served via CM/ECF on local counsel. (ASG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Jarom Whitehead to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2335202.) E. Craig Daue appearing for Plaintiff Thomas Allt (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Daue, E.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on TA Operating Montana LLC DBA Travelcenters of America on 6/18/2019, filed by Thomas Allt. (Daue, E.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Eugene Truck Haven, Inc. on 6/25/2019, filed by Thomas Allt. (Daue, E.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Tim J. George DBA Montana Mobile Truck & Trailer Repair on 6/18/2019, filed by Thomas Allt. (Daue, E.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Business Entities I through X, Eugene Truck Haven, Inc., TA Operating Montana LLC by Tim J. George. (Patten, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Eugene Truck Haven, Inc., Tim J. George, TA Operating Montana LLC. (Original mailed to Plaintiffs' counsel.) (NOS)
June 10, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2321721. (NOS)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tim J. George, Eugene Truck Haven, Inc., TA Operating Montana LLC, and Business Entities I through X filed by Thomas Allt, Adriana Allt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allt et al v. George et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana Allt
Represented By: E. Craig Daue
Represented By: Jarom A. Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Allt
Represented By: E. Craig Daue
Represented By: Jarom A. Whitehead
Represented By: Michael J. Hanby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim J. George
Represented By: James A. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Entities I through X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TA Operating Montana LLC
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Truck Haven, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Halverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?