Timlick v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jay L. Timlick
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv00099
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
2 Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 Electronic Mailing of Consent Judge DeSoto as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Erin M. Erickson, Brandon R. Shannon, Gary A. CroweConsent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 8/23/2019. (APP)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch no longer assigned to case. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/5/2019. (APP)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 02:00 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/31/2019. (TXB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference Erin M. Erickson appearing for Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Erickson, Erin)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Continue Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/26/2019. (TXB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Continue Response Time Gary A. Crowe appearing for Plaintiff Jay L. Timlick Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension) (Crowe, Gary)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for More Definite Statement, Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike Responses due by 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/3/2019. (TXB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Gary A. Crowe appearing for Plaintiff Jay L. Timlick Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Crowe, Gary)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Erickson, Erin)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Erickson, Erin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B-Memo & Order, #3 Exhibit C-Order on Pending motions) (Erickson, Erin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Erin M. Erickson appearing for Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Erickson, Erin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for More Definite Statement, Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Erickson, Erin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for More Definite Statement, Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike Erin M. Erickson appearing for Defendants Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Erickson, Erin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - Receipt of State Court Record re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (CDH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants.. (CDH)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 8/8/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 8/8/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 8/8/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/14/2019. (TCL)
June 11, 2019 Filing fee of $ 400, receipt number 0977-2322216 (KJL)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana Eleventh Judicial District Court, Flathead County, case number DV 019-374C., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timlick v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay L. Timlick
Represented By: Gary A. Crowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Brandon R. Shannon
Represented By: Erin M. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brandon R. Shannon
Represented By: Erin M. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?