Barnhouse et al v. Malvern Trust and Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: Angela Previte and Glen Barnhouse
Defendant: John Nicholson, Jay Burdic and Malvern Trust and Savings Bank
Case Number: 9:2019cv00100
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Barnhouse. Malvern Trust and Savings Bank waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McLean, Kris)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Barnhouse. Jay Burdic waiver sent on 6/14/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (McLean, Kris)
June 13, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number MTX900013802. (NOS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Originals mailed to Plaintiffs' counsel.) (NOS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Burdic, Malvern Trust and Savings Bank, John Nicholson filed by Glen Barnhouse, Angela Previte. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnhouse et al v. Malvern Trust and Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Previte
Represented By: Kris McLean
Represented By: Tyson A. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Barnhouse
Represented By: Kris McLean
Represented By: Tyson A. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Burdic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malvern Trust and Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?