Rahn v. Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Rahn
Defendant: Washington Corporations, John Does 1-5 and Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan
Case Number: 9:2019cv00141
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
2 Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan and Washington Corporations answers due 11/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/7/2019. (NOS)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Isaac M. Kantor appearing for Plaintiff Wendy Rahn Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time) (Kantor, Isaac)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Rahn. Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Washington Corporations served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Kantor, Isaac)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan, Washington Corporations. Original emailed to counsel (APP)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/28/2019. (ASG)
August 22, 2019 Filing fee of $400 received; receipt number 0977-2356728. (NOS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan, Washington Corporations, and John Does 1-5 filed by Wendy Rahn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahn v. Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Rail Link Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rahn
Represented By: Isaac M. Kantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?