United States of America v. $14,200 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $14,200 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 9:2019cv00142
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Declaration of Publication by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Advertisement Certification Report) (Francis, Victoria)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION Declaration of Arrest and Service of Warrant of Arrest In Rem by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT of of Arrest in Rem issued. Original emailed to counsel (APP)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Application for Warrant of Arrest In Rem Victoria L. Francis appearing for Plaintiff United States of America Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Warrant of Arrest In Rem) (Francis, Victoria)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (Francis, Victoria)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #2 Page 6 that was inadvertantly missing in scanned original) (ASG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $14,200 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,200 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?