Tarbert v. Azar
Plaintiff: Kelly Tarbert
Defendant: Alex Azar
Case Number: 9:2019cv00149
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have until December 2, 2019 to file an answer. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/15/2019. (ASG)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint John M. Newman appearing for Defendant Alex Azar (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Newman, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar. Original mailed to Counsel. (ASG)
August 30, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2361204. (ASG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Judicial Review and Declaratory Relief filed by Kelly Tarbert. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet, #2 exhibit) (ASG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarbert v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: John M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Tarbert
Represented By: Allan M. McGarvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?