Roe v. Leland et al
Plaintiff: Quinlan G. Roe
Defendant: Claudia Lynn Wells, Rhonda L. Leland and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2019cv00153
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and Request for Costs and Attorney Fees filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Declaration of Deborah Benjamin) (Oblander, Stephanie)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #7 MOTION to Remand and Request for Costs and Attorney Fees. Responses due by 10/31/2019. Motions ripe 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/16/2019. (dle)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Motion for Remand Stephanie A. Oblander appearing for Defendant Allstate Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Oblander, Stephanie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand and Request for Costs and Attorney Fees filed by Quinlan G. Roe. (Dailey, Timothy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand and Request for Costs and Attorney Fees filed by Quinlan G. Roe. (Dailey, Timothy)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand and Request for Costs and Attorney Fees Timothy E. Dailey appearing for Plaintiff Quinlan G. Roe (Dailey, Timothy)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donald W. Molloy for all further proceedings. Judge Dana L. Christensen no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/10/2019. (ASG)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint And Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company. (Oblander, Stephanie)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Quinlan G. Roe in state court on 6/21/2019. (ASG)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of state court documents (via file sharing program). (Attachments: #1 Doc 1, #2 Doc 2, #3 Doc 3, #4 Doc 4, #5 Doc 5, #6 Doc 6, #7 Doc 6.1, #8 Doc 7, #9 Doc 8, #10 Doc 10, #11 Doc 11, #12 Doc 12, #13 Doc 13) (ASG)
September 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX4-13909 (TAG)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, Montana, case number DV-18-1630, filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Leland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Lynn Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda L. Leland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinlan G. Roe
Represented By: Timothy E. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?