Smith v. Ripley et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Ashley Smith
Defendant: John Does 1-5, Jane Does 6-10, Chase Joseph Ripley and State of Montana
Case Number: 9:2019cv00173
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel: Quinlan L. O'Connor withdrawing from the case, filed by State of Montana (O'Connor, Quinlan)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State of Montana. (O'Connor, Quinlan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Leonard on behalf of State of Montana (Leonard, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lauren Ashley Smith. (Bell, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/13/2019. (APP)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Robert T. Bell appearing for Plaintiff Lauren Ashley Smith (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bell, Robert)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by State of Montana. (O'Connor, Quinlan)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Quinlan L. O'Connor appearing for Defendant State of Montana (O'Connor, Quinlan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in state court on August 22, 2019. (ASG)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of state court file. Original file placed on shelf in the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2_Return of Service, #2 Doc 3_Summons, #3 Doc 4_State of Montana, #4 Doc 5_Order, #5 Doc 6_Notice of Removal) (ASG)
October 23, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2388181 (TAG)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Montana from Montana Twentieth Judicial District Court, Lake County, case number DV 19-165. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Ripley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Ashley Smith
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Lance P. Jasper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Joseph Ripley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: Quinlan L. O'Connor
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?